EP0585237 - DYNAMICAL SYSTEM ANALYSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | ||
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND; Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOMHEAD, David, Sidney 3 Assarts Road Malvern Wells Worcestershire WR14 / GB | 02 /
JONES, Robin 35 Sandpiper Crescent Malvern Link Worcestershire WR14 1U7 / GB | 03 /
JOHNSON, Martin 11 Fruitlands Malvern Wells Worcestershire WR14 / GB | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver Intellectual Property Department DERA Farnborough, A4 Bldg, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver Intellectual Property Department DERA Farnborough, A4 Bldg, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | ||
Former [1994/10] | Beckham, Robert William Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough R69 Building Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92906383.2 | 03.03.1992 | [1994/10] | WO1992GB00374 | Priority number, date | GB19910060822 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: GB 91060822 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216897 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585237 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585237 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/18 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
G05B23/0221 (EP,US);
A61B5/7235 (US);
A61B5/369 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S706/902 (US);
Y10S706/903 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHER SYSTEMANALYSATOR | [1994/10] | English: | DYNAMICAL SYSTEM ANALYSER | [1994/10] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE SYSTEMES DYNAMIQUES | [1994/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 15.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0329356 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEVENTH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE/ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY vol. 2, 27 September 1985, CHICAGO,USA pages 665 - 667; ARBEZ: 'A pattern recognition system for ambulatory eeg' | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIO-MEDICAL ELECTRONICS. vol. BME27, no. 11, November 1980, NEW YORK US pages 656 - 664; BOURNE: 'The eeg analysis system of the national cooperative dialysis study' | [A] - MEASUREMENTS. vol. 6, no. 1, January 1988, LONDON GB pages 25 - 32; VAN DEN BOS: 'Model building and parameter estimation as means for intelligent measurement' |