EP0530371 - TRANSITION METAL-SPIROBENZOPYRAN COMPLEX, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND PHOTOCHROMIC MATERIAL COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-27, Ote-dori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYASHITA, Akira 84-90, Koizumi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362 / JP | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92906715.5 | 12.03.1992 | [1993/10] | WO1992JP00295 | Priority number, date | JP19910047202 | 13.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4720291 | [1993/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216538 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530371 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530371 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07F11/00, C09K9/02 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
C07F11/00 (EP,US);
Y10S430/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/10] | Title | German: | UEBERGANGSMETALL-SPIROBENZOPYRANKOMPLEX, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHOTOCHROMISCHE MATERIALE | [1993/10] | English: | TRANSITION METAL-SPIROBENZOPYRAN COMPLEX, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND PHOTOCHROMIC MATERIAL COMPRISING THE SAME | [1993/10] | French: | COMPLEXE SPIROBENZOPYRANNE-METAL DE TRANSITION, PRODUCTION DE CE COMPLEXE ET MATERIAU PHOTOCHROMIQUE CONTENANT CE COMPLEXE | [1993/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1992 | Translation filed | 12.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59202270 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK); | [A]JPS6054388 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS63267783 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | [A] - Edited by Japan Chemical Society "New experimental chemical lecture (No. 12) organic metal chemistry", March 20, 1976 (20. 03. 76), Marzen p. 114. |