EP0540698 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING DIRT PARTICLES FROM WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOCO GmbH & CO. Billbrookdeich 210 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖLK, Reinhard Archenholzstra e 73 D-2000 Hamburg 74 / DE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Glaeser, Joachim, et al Diehl Glaeser & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [2008/32] |
Former [1993/19] | Glaeser, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92906834.4 | 24.03.1992 | [1993/19] | WO1992EP00639 | Priority number, date | DE19910005485U | 03.05.1991 Original published format: DE 9105485 U | DE19914140892 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140892 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219356 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540698 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540698 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/08, B01D39/04, B01D29/15, B01D27/04 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
B01D39/083 (EP,US);
B01D24/12 (EP,US);
C02F1/003 (EP,US);
D06F39/10 (EP,US);
D06F39/20 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON SCHMUTZPARTIKELN AUS WASSER | [1993/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR REMOVING DIRT PARTICLES FROM WATER | [1993/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION DES PARTICULES POLLUANTES DE L'EAU | [1993/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.07.1995 | DK | 26.07.1995 | ES | 26.07.1995 | GR | 26.07.1995 | IT | 26.07.1995 | NL | 26.07.1995 | CH | 31.03.1996 | LI | 31.03.1996 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 26.07.1995 | |
DK | 26.07.1995 | ||
ES | 26.07.1995 | ||
GR | 26.07.1995 | ||
IT | 26.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 26.07.1995 | |
DK | 26.07.1995 | ||
GR | 26.07.1995 | ||
IT | 26.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 26.07.1995 | |
DK | 26.07.1995 | ||
IT | 26.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 26.07.1995 | |
DK | 26.07.1995 | ||
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | BE | 26.07.1995 | |
CH | 31.03.1996 | ||
LI | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 26.07.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DD313 ; | [A]GB398055 (JESUS DE LA TORRE, et al); | [A]EP0009141 (KRAUSE WALTER [DE], et al) |