EP0580615 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE ALLEYWAYS BETWEEN SHELF UNITS IN WAREHOUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fahrion, Otmar Dürerstrasse 9 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Fahrion, Otmar Dürerstrasse 9 D-70806 Kornwestheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Reinhard Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Ostertag, Reinhard Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92906963.1 | 21.03.1992 | [1994/05] | WO1992EP00628 | Priority number, date | DE19914112728 | 18.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4112728 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9218803 | Date: | 29.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580615 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580615 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16P3/14 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP,US);
G07C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE REGALGASSE | [1994/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE ALLEYWAYS BETWEEN SHELF UNITS IN WAREHOUSES | [1994/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE POUR UN COULOIR DE RAYONNAGES | [1994/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.11.1995 | IT | 29.11.1995 | [1999/42] |
Former [1996/47] | GB | 29.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3208901 (MOZELT GMBH & CO KG ANLAGETECH [DE]); | [A]EP0220361 (TELENOT ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO8704259 (DATA INSTR INC [US]); | [Y]DE3919167 |