EP0572537 - CYTOKINE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANORMED INC. No 100 20353-64th Ave Langley BC V2Y 1N5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states AnorMED Inc. No 100 20353-64th Ave Langley BC V2Y 1N5 / CA | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION UW2220, 709 Swedeland Road, P.O. Box 1539 King of Prussia, PA 19406-0939 / US | ||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION 709 Swedeland Road, P.O. Box 1539 King of Prussia, PA 19406-0939 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADGER, Alison, Mary 56 Parkridge Drive Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 / US | 02 /
HIGH, Wanda, Bernadette 545 Bob White Terrace Wayne, PA 19087 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1997/39] | Wishart, Ian Carmichael, et al Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blounts Court Sonning Common Reading, Berks RG4 9NH / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Florence, Julia Anne, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92907362.5 | 18.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992US01283 | Priority number, date | US19910657578 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: US 657578 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214462 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572537 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572537 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/40 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | CYTOKINHEMMER | [1993/49] | English: | CYTOKINE INHIBITORS | [1993/49] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CYTOKINES | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1993 | Search fee paid | 30.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 10.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 20.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4963557 (BADGER ALISON M [US], et al) |