EP0699088 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A BREAST MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBBAS, Elie 4104 N. Garland Street Alexandria, VA 22304 / US | [1996/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92907703.0 | 12.12.1991 | [1996/10] | WO1991US09255 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311827 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699088 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3962 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1996/10] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LOKALISIEREN EINES BRUSTKNOTENS | [1996/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A BREAST MASS | [1996/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE LOCALISATION D'UNE TUMEUR AU SEIN | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 16.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1994 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/10] | 16.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/10] | Request for further processing for: | 03.09.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.1994 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | 11.11.1994 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4192319 (HARGENS ALAN R [US], et al)[Y] 18-20; | [Y]EP0249456 (GENUS CATHETER TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [Y] 2 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [XY]WO9116099 (DEBBAS ELIE [US]) [X] 1,3-9,23 * the whole document * [Y] 2,18-20 | International search | [A]US3598119 (WHITE CHARLES A); | [Y]FR2565815 (LAMY LAURENT [FR]); | [Y]US4968298 (MICHELSON GARY K [US]); | [Y]US5024655 (FREEMAN ANDREW B [US], et al) |