Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06505953 | Global Dossier | 07.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | GB9200555 | 26.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0577695 | Global Dossier | 10.05.1995 | B1 | EP0577695 | 12.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | GB9200555 | 26.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2106965 | 15.10.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | GB9200555 | 26.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69202457T | 14.09.1995 | T2 | DE69202457D1 | 14.06.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | GB9200555 | 26.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9217393 | Global Dossier | 15.10.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1467692 | Global Dossier | 02.11.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE122312T | 15.05.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2073296T | 01.08.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5225990 | 06.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US67491691 | 26.03.1991 |