EP0572568 - RESEALABLE FILM CARTRIDGE FOR A LASER IMAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMBERGER, Richard, R. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
WYMAN, Stuart, J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92908467.1 | 05.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992US00890 | Priority number, date | US19910656610 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: US 656610 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215043 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572568 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572568 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C3/00, G03B42/04, B65D77/20 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
G03C3/00 (EP,KR,US);
B65D77/20 (KR);
G03B42/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE FILMKASSETTE FÜR EINE LASERABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1995/02] | English: | RESEALABLE FILM CARTRIDGE FOR A LASER IMAGER | [1993/49] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE FILM POUVANT ETRE HERMETIQUEMENT REFERMEE, POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE AU LASER | [1993/49] |
Former [1993/49] | LÖSBARE FILMKASSETTE FÜR EINE LASERABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 14.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2306240 ; | [A]EP0306982 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 91 (P-1175)5 March 1991 & JP,A,2 306 240 ( CANON ) 19 December 1990, & JP2306240 A 19901219 |