EP0635508 - TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE HAVING SUBSTITUENTS ON THREE RINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKUBO, Hiromu 4-1-301, Midorigaoka 2-chome Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882 / JP | 02 /
NAGATANI, Tadashi 4-2-101, Midorigaoka 2-chome Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882 / JP | 03 /
UEKI, Showa 10-13, Hiikawa 5-chome, Jonan-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-01 / JP | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92908473.9 | 10.04.1992 | [1995/04] | WO1992JP00460 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321189 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635508 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635508 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/435, // (C07D495/04, 333:00, 221:00) | [1995/13] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/04] | C07D495/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | AN DREI RINGEN SUBSTITUIERTE TETRAHYDROPYRIDIN-DERIVATE | [1995/04] | English: | TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE HAVING SUBSTITUENTS ON THREE RINGS | [1995/04] | French: | DERIVE DE TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE A SUBSTITUANTS SUR TROIS CYCLES | [1995/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1994 | Translation filed | 05.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 05.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPH05163278 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | [T] - HIROSHI KAWAKUBO ET AL, "Preparation of 1,2,3,4-tetrahydrobenzo(b)thieno(2,3-c)pyridine-3-carboxamide derivatives as central nervous system agents", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940523), vol. 120, no. 21, Database accession no. 270355b, page 1065 [T] 1 * abstract * | [T] - HIROMU KAWAKUBO ET AL, "(R)-1,2,3,4-Tetrahydro(1)benzothieno(2,3-c)pyridines: Novel optically active compounds with strong 5-HT1a receptor binding ability exhibiting anticonflict activity and lessening of memory impairment", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., WASHINGTON US, (19931112), vol. 36, no. 23, pages 3526 - 3532 [T] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6396188 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH02149583 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |