EP0535201 - METHOD FOR HONING BORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/14] | HONING TOOL FOR MACHINING BORES | ||
[1997/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Gehring GmbH & Co. Gehringstrasse 28 D-73760 Ostfildern / DE | [1993/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINK, Ulrich Paulusstr. 37 D-7442 Neuffen / DE | 02 /
WIEDERHOLD, Joachim Christallerweg 1 D-7060 Schorndorf / DE | 03 /
GEHRUNG, Bernd Lerchenweg 1 D-7302 Ostfildern 3 / DE | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Kerkhof, Marianne, et al Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Kerkhof, Marianne, et al Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92908731.0 | 15.04.1992 | [1993/14] | WO1992EP00844 | Priority number, date | EP19910106010 | 16.04.1991 Original published format: EP 91106010 | [1993/27] |
Former [1993/14] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9218287 | Date: | 29.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535201 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535201 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B33/08 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B24B33/10 (EP);
B24B33/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HONEN VON BOHRUNGEN | [1997/01] | English: | METHOD FOR HONING BORES | [1997/01] | French: | PROCEDE A HONER D'ALESAGES | [1997/01] |
Former [1993/14] | HONWERKZEUG ZUM BEARBEITEN VON BOHRUNGEN | ||
Former [1993/14] | HONING TOOL FOR MACHINING BORES | ||
Former [1993/14] | OUTIL A HONER POUR L'USINAGE D'ALESAGES | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3330078 ; | [Y]US1772045 ; | [A]US4065881 ; | [A]US2166281 ; | [A]EP0219825 ; | [A]US2263781 ; | [A]FR2187498 ; | [A]US2421470 ; | [A]FR2572978 ; | [A]DE2120519 |