EP0528026 - NEW MESO-AZACYCLIC AROMATIC ACID AMIDES AND ESTERS AS NOVEL SEROTONERGIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D. Searle & Co. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states G.D. SEARLE & CO. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Daniel, P. 1427 Pebble Creek Drive Glenview, IL 60025 / US | 02 /
FLYNN, Daniel, L. 17 N. Bristol Court Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 03 /
MOORMANN, Alan, Edward 9450 Latrobe Avenue Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 04 /
NOSAL, Roger 667 Aspen Drive Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | 05 /
VILLAMIL, Clara, I. 813 Long Road Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Beil, Hans Christoph, et al BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL Rechtsanwälte Postfach 80 01 40 65901 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Beil, Hans Chr., Dr., et al BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40 D-65901 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92908769.0 | 04.03.1992 | [1993/08] | WO1992US01525 | Priority number, date | US19910666151 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: US 666151 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215590 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528026 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D487/08, C07D471/08, A61K31/40, A61K31/435, A61K31/55, A61K31/53, A61K31/505 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Meso-azacyclische aromatisch Carbonsäureamide und ester serotonergische Mittel | [1993/08] | English: | NEW MESO-AZACYCLIC AROMATIC ACID AMIDES AND ESTERS AS NOVEL SEROTONERGIC AGENTS | [1993/08] | French: | NOUVEAUX AMIDES ET ESTERS D'ACIDES AROMATIQUES MESO-AZACYCLIQUES SERVANT DE NOUVEAUX AGENTS SEROTONERGIQUES | [1993/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/02] | 17.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4409225 (HADLEY MICHAEL S [GB]); | [AP]EP0454121 (SEARLE & CO [US]) |