EP0585248 - DOLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCEPTS DEVELOPMENT AUSTRALIA PTY LTD 28 Lacey Street Perth Western Australia 6000 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states CONCEPTS DEVELOPMENT AUSTRALIA PTY LTD 28 Lacey Street Perth, Western Australia 6000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRACAS, Victor Manuel Lot 11, Old Clifton Road, Lake Clifton Waroona, W.A. 6125 / AU | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Brauneiss, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 1031 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1994/10] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 92908864.9 | 24.04.1992 | [1994/10] | WO1992AU00181 | Priority number, date | AU19910005781 | 24.04.1991 Original published format: AU 578191 | AU19910006400 | 30.05.1991 Original published format: AU 640091 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219343 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585248 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585248 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A63H3/33, A63H3/48, A63H3/40 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
A63H3/28 (EP,US);
A63H3/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | A63H3/33, A63H3/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/10] | Title | German: | PUPPE | [1994/10] | English: | DOLL | [1994/10] | French: | POUPEE | [1994/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 13.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2008775 (RAFFAELI CORRADO, et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, line 7 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR1023644 (RUIZ) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US3628283 (MIZOULE HENRI) [A] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3888233 (WARE H JOE) [A] 10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4424644 (SAPKUS JURGIS [US], et al); | [A]AU6633381 (QUAKER OATS CO); | [A]AU3574878 (GEN MILLS FUN GROUP INC); | [A]US3295253 (ROBERT GARDEL, et al) |