EP0529065 - RECEPTOR-BASED SCREENING METHODS FOR AMYLIN AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Town Centre Drive, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Town Centre Drive, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUMONT, Kevin 11248 Sirias Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
RINK, Timothy, J. 1839 Caminito Brisa La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92908951.4 | 13.03.1992 | [1993/09] | WO1992US02125 | Priority number, date | US19910670231 | 15.03.1991 Original published format: US 670231 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216845 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529065 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529065 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/566, G01N33/567, G01N33/74, G01N33/577, C12P21/08 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/28 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/09] | G01N33/566, G01N33/567 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | AUF REZEPTORGRUNDLAGE ARBEITENDE SCREENING-VERFAHREN FÜR AMYLIN-AGONISTEN UND- ANTAGONISTEN | [1993/09] | English: | RECEPTOR-BASED SCREENING METHODS FOR AMYLIN AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS | [1993/09] | French: | PROCEDES DE CRIBLAGE UTILISANT DES RECEPTEURS ET PERMETTANT LA DETECTION D'AGONISTES ET D'ANTAGONISTES DE L'AMYLINE | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.1998 | BE | 21.10.1998 | CH | 21.10.1998 | ES | 21.10.1998 | FR | 21.10.1998 | GR | 21.10.1998 | IT | 21.10.1998 | LI | 21.10.1998 | NL | 21.10.1998 | LU | 13.03.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
ES | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 21.10.1998 | ||
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
NL | 21.10.1998 | ||
LU | 13.03.1999 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
ES | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 21.10.1998 | ||
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
NL | 21.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
ES | 21.10.1998 | ||
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
NL | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
ES | 21.10.1998 | ||
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
GR | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 26.01.1999 | ||
LI | 26.01.1999 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
FR | 19.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 21.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4434236 (FREYTAG J WILLIAM [US]); | [Y]WO8906135 (AMYLIN CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0408294 (AMYLIN CORP [US]) | [Y] - Diabetes, Volume 39, issued July 1990, T. MORISHITA et al., "Activation of adenylate cyclase by islet amyloid polypeptide with COOH-terminal amide via calcitonin gene-related peptide receptors on rat liver plasma membranes", pages 875-877, see the Abstract. | [Y] - Diabetes, Volume 40, issued March 1991, R.W. STEPHENS et al., "Presence of liver CGPR/amylin receptors in only nonparenchymal cells and absence of direct regulation of rat liver glucose metabolism by CGPR/amylin", pages 395-400, see the Abstract. | [A] - Nature, Volume 335, issued 13 October 1988, B. LEIGHTON et al., "Pancreatic amylin and calcitonin gene related peptide cause resistance to insulin in skeletal muscle in vitro", pages 632-635, see the Abstract. | [Y] - Fertility and Sterility, Volume 26, Number 5, issued 5 May 1975, B.B. SAXENA et al., "The use of a radioreceptorassay of human chorionic gonadotropin for the diagnosis and management of ectopic pregnancy", pages 397-404, see page 398. |