EP0584127 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROL OF SOLIDIFICATION IN LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTON, Elizabeth New Hall Huntingdon Road Cambridge GB3 0DF / GB | For all designated states MORRIS, George John Thatched Cottage Caxton Road Bourn Cambridge CB5 7SX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states ACTON, Elizabeth New Hall, Huntingdon Road Cambridge GB3 0DF / GB | ||
For all designated states MORRIS, George John Thatched Cottage, Caxton Road Bourn, Cambridge CB5 7SX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92909566.9 | 05.05.1992 | [1994/09] | WO1992GB00818 | Priority number, date | GB19910009640 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9109640 | GB19920004829 | 06.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9204829 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220420 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584127 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584127 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/00 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
B01D9/005 (EP);
A23D7/05 (EP);
A23D9/02 (EP);
A23G1/18 (EP);
A23G3/0226 (EP);
A23G9/04 (EP);
A23G9/08 (EP);
A23G9/14 (EP);
A23L3/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DER ERSTARRUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1997/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROL OF SOLIDIFICATION IN LIQUIDS | [1994/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR MAITRISER LA SOLIDIFICATION DE LIQUIDES | [1994/09] |
Former [1994/09] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DER ERSTARRUNG VON FLUSSIGKEITEN | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | 15.01.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.06.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/49] | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 11.04.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.03.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   11.03.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.03.1997 | NL | 12.03.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
LI | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 12.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU1153942 ; | [Y]DE840389 ; | [X]FR1099427 ; | [X]FR1418859 | [X] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES. vol. 56, no. 11, November 1967, WASHINGTON US pages 1373 - 1385; D.M. SKAUEN: 'SOME PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS OF ULTRASONICS' CRISTALLIZATON |