EP0540705 - PLATE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eberhard Hoesch & Söhne GmbH Verfahrens- und Anlagentechnik Eschweiler Str. 101-109 D-52477 Alsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states Eberhard Hoesch & Söhne GmbH Verfahrens- und Anlagentechnik Eschweiler Str. 101-109 D-52477 Alsdorf / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states EBERHARD HOESCH & SÖHNE GmbH Verfahrens- und Anlagentechnik Hüttenstrasse 31 D-52355 Düren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN EGDOM, Richard, sen. Bahnhofstr. 45 D-5164 Nörvenich / DE | 02 /
GEISS, Rudolf Lyatenstr. 6 D-5162 Niederzier / DE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Langmaack, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 D-50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92909595.8 | 09.05.1992 | [1993/19] | WO1992EP01022 | Priority number, date | DE19914116874 | 23.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4116874 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220424 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540705 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540705 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/127, B01D25/28, B01D25/30 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
B01D25/127 (EP,US);
B01D25/1275 (EP,US);
B01D25/285 (EP,US);
B01D25/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/19] | Title | German: | PLATTENFILTER | [1993/19] | English: | PLATE FILTER | [1993/19] | French: | FILTRE A PLAQUES | [1993/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Request for further processing for: | 14.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.01.1995 | CH | 31.05.1995 | LI | 31.05.1995 | [1997/13] |
Former [1995/42] | BE | 25.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1461500 (UK NI I KI KHIM MASH); | [A]US3968039 (INUJIMA KAZUO, et al) |