EP0583330 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANODIC FILMS EXHIBITING COLOURED PATTERNS AND STRUCTURES INCOPORATING SUCH FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOZEFOWICZ, Mark, Adrian 294 College Street Kingston, Ontario K7L 4M4 / CA | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92909961.2 | 06.05.1992 | [1994/08] | WO1992CA00201 | Priority number, date | US19910696840 | 07.05.1991 Original published format: US 696840 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219796 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583330 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/18, C25D11/22 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
C25D11/22 (EP,US);
C25D11/18 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ANODISCHER FILME,DIE FARBIGE MUSTER ZEIGEN,SOWIE SOLCHE FILME EINBAUENDE STRUKTUREN | [1994/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANODIC FILMS EXHIBITING COLOURED PATTERNS AND STRUCTURES INCOPORATING SUCH FILMS | [1994/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FILMS ANODIQUES A MOTIFS COLORES ET STRUCTURES COMPORTANT DE TELS FILMS | [1994/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/24] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, 1976, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 128036T, TANAKA: 'beige electrolytic coloring of aluminium and its alloys' page 430 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, 1976, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 128037U, TANAKA: 'electrolytic coloring of aluminium and its alloys' page 430 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, 1980, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 49426G, TODA: 'multi-step electrolytic coloring of anodised aluminium and its alloys' page 492 ; |