EP0583333 - BASE STACKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.A. FORD PTY. LTD. 19 Clarice Road Box Hill, VIC 3128 / AU | [1994/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Wayne, Athol 30 Dudley Road Wonga Park, VIC 3115 / AU | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Newby, Martin John Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Newby, Martin John J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14-18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92910016.2 | 05.05.1992 | [1994/08] | WO1992AU00205 | Priority number, date | AU19910006071 | 09.05.1991 Original published format: AU 607191 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219499 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583333 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/10, B65B25/00, B65B35/56, B65G57/22 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
B65D85/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | STAPELVERFAHREN FÜR STÜTZTEILE | [1994/08] | English: | BASE STACKING METHOD | [1994/08] | French: | METHODE D'EMPILAGE DE PIETEMENTS | [1994/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 13.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 13.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/38] | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8502999U (SIEMENS) [A] 1,2,11,12,21-23,25,26 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4919263 (BALTZER DONALD L [US], et al); | [A]FR2477106 (SEYS DOMINIQUE [FR]) |