EP0544851 - PRESSURE-CONTROLLED ADJUSTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIEL, Rudolf Am Ebelfeld 179 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 90 / DE | 02 /
DÖLL, Andreas Gerhard-Hauptmann-Ring 32 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | 03 /
HALASY-WIMMER, Georg Götzenstrasse 1 D-6236 Eschborn / DE | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/44] |
Former [1993/23] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92910264.8 | 15.05.1992 | [1993/23] | WO1992EP01075 | Priority number, date | DE19914121054 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121054 | [1993/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300527 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544851 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544851 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/56 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2123/00 (EP,US);
F16D2125/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/23] | Title | German: | DRUCKGESTEUERTE NACHSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGBREMSE | [1993/23] | English: | PRESSURE-CONTROLLED ADJUSTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE BRAKE | [1993/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RATTRAPAGE DE JEU COMMANDE PAR PRESSION POUR UN FREIN DE VEHICULE | [1993/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/38] | Request for further processing for: | 17.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.05.1998 | [1999/25] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3920103 (HARAIKAWA TETSUO); | [A]EP0154398 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [X]DE2636445 ; | [X]DE3802014 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [X]DE8811920U ; | [XP]DE3943106 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) |