EP0598120 - NOISE CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU TEN, LTD. 2-28, Goshodori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 652 / JP | [1994/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAMI, Masaaki 403-go, Century 21 1412, Toba Akashi-shi Hyogo 673 / JP | 02 /
SAKO, Kazuya 642-43, Kitano Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 653 / JP | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92910577.3 | 26.05.1992 | [1994/21] | WO1992JP00680 | Priority number, date | JP19910127632 | 30.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12763291 | JP19910195449 | 05.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19544991 | [1994/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222054 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598120 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598120 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
G10K11/17823 (EP,US);
G10K11/17854 (EP,US);
G10K11/17879 (EP,US);
G10K2210/107 (EP);
G10K2210/1282 (EP);
G10K2210/3031 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/21] | Title | German: | LÄRMÜBERWACHUNGSGERÄT | [1994/21] | English: | NOISE CONTROL APPARATUS | [1994/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATTENUATION DES BRUITS | [1994/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.1993 | Translation filed | 18.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 18.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH01314500 (NERUSON IND INC); | [Y]JPH0241954 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH0270195 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO, et al); | [Y]JPH02218296 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JPH02306845 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [A]JPH0350998 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JPS62164400 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO, et al); | [A]JPS6458200 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO) |