EP0581857 - GRANULAR LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED SOLUBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANCHERI, Eugene, Joseph 7420 Thumbelina Lane Montgomery, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
KOC, Meleksima 5490 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati, OH 45236 / US | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 92910938.7 | 14.04.1992 | [1994/06] | WO1992US03047 | Priority number, date | US19910688009 | 19.04.1991 Original published format: US 688009 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9218596 | Date: | 29.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581857 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581857 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/10, C11D3/12 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
C11D3/128 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/10 (EP,US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/33] |
Former [1994/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | KöRNIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER LöSLICHKEIT | [1996/01] | English: | GRANULAR LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED SOLUBILITY | [1994/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERSIVES GRANULAIRES POUR LESSIVE, PRESENTANT UNE SOLUBILITE AMELIOREE | [1994/06] |
Former [1994/06] | Körnige Waschmittelzusammensetzungen mit verbesserter löslichkeit | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0110588 ; | [Y]EP0313144 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0419036 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [XP]EP0456315 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |