EP0591253 - SPECULUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDITECH INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD. 28 Lacey Street Perth, W.A. 6000 / AU | [1994/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRACAS, Victor Manuel Lot 11, Old Coast Road, Lake Clifton Waroona, W.A. 6215 / AU | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911209.2 | 05.06.1992 | [1994/15] | WO1992AU00261 | Priority number, date | AU19910006539 | 06.06.1991 Original published format: AU 653991 | AU19920000637 | 03.02.1992 Original published format: AU 63792 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221279 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591253 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/32 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
A61B1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/15] | Title | German: | SPEKULUM | [1994/15] | English: | SPECULUM | [1994/15] | French: | SPECULUM | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 04.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/03] | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/03] | Request for further processing for: | 12.09.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR542744 (L. DELANNOY ET AL.) [X] 1,2,16,25,28 * page 1, line 1 - line 34 * * page 2, line 24 - line 80; figure - *; | [A]DE11463 (L. REISMAN) [A] 1,17,21-23,28 * the whole document * | International search | [A]DE2708071 (EFFNER & SPREINE URSUL); | [A]GB330629 (EDWARD BARON); | [A]FR2490478 (CHOURAQUI ALBERT [FR]); | [X]US2083573 (MORGAN CLIFFORD V) |