EP0535218 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A HIGH DEFINITION LIGHT MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Science Technologies 520 Washington Boulevard, PMB 422 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 / US | [2001/16] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states EDGE SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENT COMPANY L.L.C. 1630 17th Street Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | ||
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states EDGE SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENT CORPORATION L.L.C. 1630 17th Street Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | ||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states UNIMAT (USA) CORPORATION Arco Center, 1055 West Seventh Street, Suite 2500 Los Angeles, CA 90017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenberg, Gary 4231 Kenyon Avenue Los Angeles California 90066 / US | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Barnard, Eric Edward BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92911614.3 | 20.03.1992 | [1993/14] | WO1992US02260 | Priority number, date | US19910688170 | 19.04.1991 Original published format: US 688170 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9218894 | Date: | 29.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535218 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/36, G02B21/06, G02B21/08 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
G02B21/086 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/14] | G02B21/36, G02B21/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/14] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM UND -METHODE FÜR EIN HOCH AUFLÖSENDES LICHTMIKROSKOP | [1993/14] | English: | ILLUMINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A HIGH DEFINITION LIGHT MICROSCOPE | [1993/14] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ECLAIRAGE POUR MICROSCOPE OPTIQUE A HAUTE DEFINITION | [1993/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/50] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5949514 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840713), vol. 8, no. 151, Database accession no. (P - 286)<1588> , & JP59049514 A 19840322 (OLYMPUS KOGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 24 | International search | [X]US3876283 (JUDD DUANE E); | [A]US4109999 (KIYONO YUTAKA, et al); | [A]US4657357 (NISHIMURA SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4474023 (MULLINS JR JAMES N [US]) |