EP0586507 - A STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VUORENMAA, Pauli Väppebyvägen 8 198 00 Balsta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states VUORENMAA, Pauli Veppebyvägen 8 S-198 00 Balsta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 92911895.8 | 03.06.1992 | [1994/11] | WO1992SE00382 | Priority number, date | SE19910001712 | 05.06.1991 Original published format: SE 9101712 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221546 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586507 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/06 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
B62D7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | LENKEINRICHTUNG | [1994/11] | English: | A STEERING DEVICE | [1994/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION | [1994/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1994 | 30.06.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2831699 |