EP0562054 - TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX FOR USE AS A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC PHARMACEUTICAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/39] | MULTIFUNCTIONAL LIGAND FOR USE AS A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC PHARMACEUTICAL | ||
[1998/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI 509 Lewis Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | [1993/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATTI, Kattesh, V. 6D Granada Columbia, MO 65203 / US | 02 /
VOLKERT, Wynn, Arthur 2203 Garden Drive Columbia, MO 65202 / US | 03 /
KETRING, Alan, Reed 12150 Route N Columbia, MO 65203 / US | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | ||
Former [1993/39] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912237.2 | 01.05.1992 | [1993/39] | WO1992US03662 | Priority number, date | US19910694142 | 01.05.1991 Original published format: US 694142 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219573 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562054 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562054 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/53, C07F7/30, C07F7/00, C07F15/00, C07F15/06, C07F1/00 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
A61K51/0478 (EP);
A61K51/0489 (EP);
C07F13/00 (EP);
C07F13/005 (EP);
C07F15/0066 (EP);
C07F15/065 (EP);
C07F19/005 (EP);
C07F7/003 (EP);
C07F7/30 (EP);
C07F9/065 (EP);
C07F9/228 (EP);
C07F9/4496 (EP);
C07F9/5355 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/48] | C07F9/53, C07F7/30, C07F7/00 | ||
Former IPC [1993/39] | C07F9/53, C07F7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | ÜBERGANGSMETALLKOMPLEX ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS DIAGNOSTISCHES ODER THERAPEUTISCHES ARZNEIMITTEL | [1998/52] | English: | TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX FOR USE AS A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC PHARMACEUTICAL | [1998/52] | French: | COMPLEX D' UN METAL DE TRANSITION UTILISE COMME PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE A DES FINS THERAPEUTIQUES OU DIAGNOSTIQUES | [1998/52] |
Former [1993/39] | MULTIFUNKTIONELLER LIGAND ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS DIAGNOSTISCHES ODER THERAPEUTISCHES ARZNEIMITTEL | ||
Former [1993/39] | MULTIFUNCTIONAL LIGAND FOR USE AS A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC PHARMACEUTICAL | ||
Former [1993/39] | LIGAND POLYFONCTIONNEL UTILISE COMME PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE A DES FINS THERAPEUTIQUES OU DIAGNOSTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 04.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.06.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | 10.06.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.07.1993 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.1999 | FR | 22.09.1999 | GR | 22.09.1999 | IT | 22.09.1999 | SE | 22.09.1999 | DE | 23.12.1999 | DK | 01.05.2000 | GB | 01.05.2000 | LU | 01.05.2000 | ES | 03.05.2000 | BE | 31.05.2000 | CH | 31.05.2000 | LI | 31.05.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
GR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
DK | 01.05.2000 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
LU | 01.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2004/37] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
GR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
DK | 01.05.2000 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
ES | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
GR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
DK | 01.05.2000 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
DK | 01.05.2000 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/32] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
FR | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
DE | 23.12.1999 | ||
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
GB | 01.05.2000 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 22.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NISHIDA, Y. ET AL., "ESR SPECTRA OF SEVEN-COORDINATED PENTAGONAL BIPYRAMIDAL COPPER(II) COMPLEXES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19801201), vol. 93, no. 22, Database accession no. 212784d, page 547 [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * | [ ] - INORG. CHIM. ACTA, (1980), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 113 - 114 | [X] - NOETH, H. ET AL., "STABILIZATION OF TRIS(HYDRAZINO)PHOSPHINE BY COMPLEX FORMATION", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19810824), vol. 95, no. 8, Database accession no. 72376m, page 724 [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * | [ ] - Z. NATURFORSCH., B: ANORG. CHEM., ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 36B, no. 6, pages 659 - 661 | [X] - MAISCH, H., "STABILIZATION OF PHOSPHANES P(NHX)3 BY LIGAND REACTIONS OF PENTACARBONYL(TRICHLOROPHOSPHANE)MOLYBDENUM(0)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790917), vol. 91, no. 12, Database accession no. 101291e, page 670 [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * | [ ] - Z. NATURFORSCH., B: ANORG. CHEM., ORG. CHEM., (1979), vol. 34B, no. 6, pages 784 - 789 | International search | [A] - Tetrahechon, Vol. 32, 1976, MAJORAL et al., "Keterocycler Content Du Phosphore XXXIX", pp. 2633-2644 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 87, No. 19, issued 7 November 1977 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), GRAPOV et al., "Some reactions of phosphours, his acid dihydrazides", Abstract No. 152323s; & Zh obshch Khim (1977), 47(8), pp. 1704-11. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 88, No. 7, issued 13 February 1978 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), MAJORAL et al., "Heterocycles containing phosphous XXXII", Abstract No. 50967h; & Heterocyclic Chemistry (1977), 14(5), pp. 749-55. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 76, No. 20, issued 15 May 1972, HUANG et al., "Polymers containing phosphous", Abstract No. 113579h; & Kozyo Kogaher Zasshi (1971), 77(11), pp. 2406-9. | [X] - Chemische Berichte, Vol. 100, No. 7 (1967), HORN et al., "Darstellung von Thiophosphoyltrihydrazide, ect.", pp. 2258-2260 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 69, No. 25, issued 16 December 1968, SCOLER et al., "N,N'-Disubstituted P-phenylphosphonothioic diamcles", Abstract No. 106808; & J. Chem. Eng. Data (1968), 13(4), pp. 571-2. | Examination | - SCOLA et al., "N,N'-Disubstituted P-phenylphosphonothioic diamides", J. Chem. Eng. Data (1968), 13(4), pp. 571-572. |