EP0586536 - AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS COMPRISING A NEGATIVE ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/11] | COMBINED MULTI-MODAL AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND NEGATIVE ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
[1997/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC. 2100 Lake Park Blvd. Richardson, TX 75080-2254 / US | [1994/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USELTON, Robert, B. 543 Wilson Street Lancaster, TX 75146 / US | 02 /
DEAN, William, J. 1810 Big Bend Grapevine, TX 76501 / US | 03 /
LONGMAN, Michael, G. 2116 Fairmont Drive Flower Mound, TX 75028 / US | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1994/11] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92912452.7 | 27.05.1992 | [1994/11] | WO1992US04487 | Priority number, date | US19910706057 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: US 706057 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221921 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586536 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F25D16/00, F24F5/00 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
F24F5/0017 (EP,US);
F25D16/00 (EP,US);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/11] | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE MIT SYSTEM ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON NEGATIVER ENERGIE | [1997/16] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS COMPRISING A NEGATIVE ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | [1997/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE D'ENERGIE NEGATIVE | [1997/16] |
Former [1994/11] | KOMBINIERTE MEHRMODELL KLIMAANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON NEGATIVER ENERGIE | ||
Former [1994/11] | COMBINED MULTI-MODAL AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND NEGATIVE ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
Former [1994/11] | APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION MULTIMODAL ET SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE D'ENERGIE NEGATIVE COMBINES | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/17] | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/17] | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4637219 (GROSE RONALD D [US]); | [X]US4964279 (OSBORNE WILLIAM T [US]); | [Y]US4735064 (FISCHER HARRY C [US]); | [A]US2246401 (WATERFILL ROBERT W, et al); | [A]US2512576 (CROSS JOSEPH A); | [A]US2096065 (SIEGFRIED RUPPRICHT); | [A]DE1015019 (IDEAL STANDARD); | [A]US2185022 (CANDOR ROBERT R); | [A]FR1394014 (TRANSTHERMOS G M B H) |