EP0595834 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew PLC Heron House 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew PLC Heron House 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew plc 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | ||
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW P.L.C. 2 Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDSON, Mark Christopher Pear Tree Cottage Main Street, Huby, York North Yorkshire Y06 1HS / GB | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 92913179.5 | 19.06.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992GB01112 | Priority number, date | GB19910134486 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: GB 91134486 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300118 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595834 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/44, A61L15/58 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
A61L2300/206 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
Y10S528/905 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/58, A61L15/46, C08L33/00, C08L29/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND PRODUKTE | [2000/16] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND PRODUCTS | [1994/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PRODUITS ADHESIFS | [1994/19] |
Former [1994/19] | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND PRODUKTEN | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/30] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/30] | Request for further processing for: | 29.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2073013 ; | [X]EP0011471 (SMITH & NEPHEW RES [GB]); | [X]EP0023395 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]EP0065370 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]); | [X]EP0065399 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]); | [Y]EP0240097 (SURGIKOS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0256893 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]); | [A]GB2186486 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS) | [X] - World Patents Index (Latest), week 9016, AN=90-121106, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB, & JP,A,2073013 (NIKKO JAKUHIN K.K.) 13 March 1990, see abstract, & JP2073013 A 19900313 |