EP0537337 - MICROWAVE CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO ELECTRON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 9550 Distribution Avenue San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1993/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVEY, Brett, A. 131 Seeman Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Paul, A. 1015 Zapata Avenue San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
SHEK, Alex 9666 Carroll Canyon Road No. E7 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 04 /
PHILLIPS, Chester, C. 12768 Rancho Penasquitos No. 50 San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92913281.9 | 27.04.1992 | [1993/16] | WO1992US03488 | Priority number, date | US19910694098 | 01.05.1991 Original published format: US 694098 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219986 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537337 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537337 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/02 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
H01Q19/175 (EP,US);
G01R29/0892 (EP,US);
G01S17/58 (EP,US);
G01S17/95 (EP,US);
G01S7/486 (EP,US);
G02F1/09 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/16] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENKAMERA | [1993/16] | English: | MICROWAVE CAMERA | [1993/16] | French: | CAMERA A HYPERFREQUENCES | [1993/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1993 | Search fee paid | 21.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.1998 | 30.04.2001 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.04.2002 | [2003/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4633170 (BURNS WILLIAM K [US]) [Y] 6,12,13,15,16 * column 1, line 19 - line 49 ** column 2, line 11 - line 46; figure 3 * | International search | [A]US4521861 (LOGAN RUSSELL H [US], et al); | [XY]US4654666 (WILEY CARL A [US]); | [A]US4864308 (RAAB ANTHONY R [CA], et al); | [A]US4910523 (HUGUENIN RICHARD G [US], et al) |