Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.06.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] |
29.05.1997 | Renewal fee | |
25.04.1997 | Application refused | |
04.06.1996 | Renewal fee | |
12.03.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
19.01.1996 | First examination report | |
17.01.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
17.08.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
05.05.1994 | Change - name/address | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
10.03.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] |
10.03.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] |