Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9322839 | Global Dossier | 11.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9203742 | 05.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06508963 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9203742 | 05.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0593531 | Global Dossier | 27.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9203742 | 05.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5541443 | 30.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9203742 | 05.05.1992 |