EP0593531 - ACTIVE OPTICAL LOGIC DEVICE INCORPORATING A SURFACE-EMITTING LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | ||
For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston, New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | |||
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | ||
For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston, New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yong, Hee 410-55 Samboo Apt. Taepyung-dong, Choong-ku Taejon / KR | 02 /
SONG, Jong-In 1108 Knollwood Drive Middletown, NJ 07748 / US | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92913320.5 | 05.05.1992 | [1994/17] | WO1992US03742 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322839 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593531 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/14, H01L27/14, H01L27/15 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
H03K19/14 (EP,US);
H01L27/15 (EP,US);
H01S5/0261 (EP,US);
H01S5/0262 (EP,US);
H01S5/042 (EP,US);
H01S5/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/17] | Title | German: | Aktive Vorrichtung mit in Oberflächenrichtung abstralendem Laser | [1994/17] | English: | ACTIVE OPTICAL LOGIC DEVICE INCORPORATING A SURFACE-EMITTING LASER | [1994/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF LOGIQUE OPTIQUE ACTIF COMPORTANT UN LASER A RAYONNEMENT EN SURFACE | [1994/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.06.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5059788 (TASHIRO YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) | [X] - IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS vol. 4, no. 5, 4 May 1992, NEW YORK US pages 479 - 482 Y.H. LEE ET AL. 'Active optical NOR logic devices using surface-emitting lasers' | [Y] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS vol. 27, no. 3, 31 January 1991, NY US pages 216 - 217 Y.H. LEE ET AL. 'Cascadable laser logic devices; discrete integration of phototransistors with surface-emitting laser diodes' cited in the application | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 107 (E-247)(1544) 19 May 1984 |