EP0590023 - TONOMETRY SENSOR CALIBRATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALARIS Medical Systems, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121-2733 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states ALARIS Medical Systems, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121-2733 / US | ||
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Alaris Medical Systems, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121-2733 / US | ||
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states IVAC MEDICAL SYSTEMS, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121-2733 / US | ||
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states IVAC MEDICAL SYSTEMS, Inc. 10300 Campus Point Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states IVAC CORPORATION 10300 Campus Pt. Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1579 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Stephen, A. 2812 Sombrose Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
BUTTERFIELD, Robert 13980 Poway Valley Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 03 /
PYTEL, Kenneth, J. 2949 Frankel Way San Diego, CA 92111 / US | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.) Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92913344.5 | 17.06.1992 | [1994/14] | WO1992US05095 | Priority number, date | US19910717224 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: US 717224 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222242 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590023 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590023 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022, A61B5/021 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
A61B5/02422 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/02241 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | A61B5/022 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/14] | Title | German: | EICHGERÄT FÜR EINEN TOMOMETRIE-SENSOR | [1994/14] | English: | TONOMETRY SENSOR CALIBRATION APPARATUS | [1994/14] | French: | APPAREIL D'ETALONNAGE DE CAPTEUR POUR TONOMETRIE | [1994/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1993 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Request for further processing for: | 12.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4658829 (WALLACE WILLIAM D [US]); | [A]US4901733 (KAIDA NORIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4572204 (STEPHENS THOMAS P [US]) |