EP0587786 - COATED CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTHANAM, Anakkavur, T. 2101 Ramsey Road Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 02 /
GODSE, Rajendra, V. C-11 Foxglove Drive Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Bunke, Holger, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92913847.7 | 01.04.1992 | [1994/12] | WO1992US02791 | Priority number, date | US19910708422 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 708422 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221472 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587786 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587786 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/20, B23B27/16 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23C2200/201 (EP,US);
B23C2200/205 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER SCHNEIDEINSATZ | [1994/12] | English: | COATED CUTTING INSERT | [1994/12] | French: | INSERT DE COUPE RECOUVERT | [1994/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4942097 (SANTHANAM ANAKKAVUR T [US], et al); | [Y]US4984940 (BRYANT WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US4830886 (CHO TOSHIAKI [US], et al) | [Y] - VDI Berichte, 20 September 1989, SUGAYA et al., "Einsatz von Hartmetallen mit CVD-Mehrfachbeschichtungen beim Fraesen von Gusseisen in der Fertigung", pp. 211-220. |