EP0547201 - PHAGEMIDE FOR SCREENING ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 D-69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITLING, Frank Am Schlossberg 49 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
LITTLE, Melvyn Fritz-von Briesen-Str. 10 D-6903 Neckargemünd-Dilsberg / DE | 03 /
DÜBEL, Stefan Quinckestr. 24 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
BRAUNAGEL, Michael C 2, 1 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 05 /
KLEWINGHAUS, Iris Richard-Wagner-Str. 30 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | [2001/25] |
Former [1993/25] | 01 /
BREITLING, Frank Am Schlossberg 49 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
LITTLE, Melvyn Fritz-von Briesen-Str. 10 D-6903 Neckargemünd-Dilsberg / DE | |||
03 /
DÜBELS, Stefan Quinckestr. 24 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
BRAUNAGEL, Michael C 2, 1 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | |||
05 /
KLEWINGHAUS, Iris Richard-Wagner-Str. 30 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr., et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/25] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92914199.2 | 06.07.1992 | [1993/25] | WO1992EP01524 | Priority number, date | DE19914122599 | 08.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122599 | [1993/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301288 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547201 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547201 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12P21/08, C12Q1/68, C07K16/00, G01N33/53 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C40B40/02 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C12N15/1037 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10022 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10322 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/25] | C12N15/13, C12P21/08, C12Q1/68, C07K15/28, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | PHAGEMID ZUM SCREENEN VON ANTIKÖRPERN | [1993/25] | English: | PHAGEMIDE FOR SCREENING ANTIBODIES | [1993/25] | French: | PHAGEMIDE UTILE POUR TRIER DES ANTICORPS | [1993/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00118282.3 / EP1065271 | EP08017685.2 / EP2025753 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2001
02.09.2005
WITHDRAWN Affitech AS Forskningsparken 0349 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 02
21.12.2001
12.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited The Science Park Melbourn, Cambridgeshire SG8 6EJ / GB Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2001
02.09.2005
WITHDRAWN Affitech AS Forskningsparken 0349 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
02
21.12.2001
12.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited The Science Park Melbourn, Cambridgeshire SG8 6EJ / GB Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2002/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2001
Affitech AS Forskningsparken 0349 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
02
21.12.2001
ADMISSIBLE Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited The Science Park Melbourn, Cambridgeshire SG8 6EJ / GB Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2002/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2001
WITHDRAWN Affitech AS Forskningsparken 0349 Oslo / NO Opponent's representative Jones, Elizabeth Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | 22.04.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.09.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/13] | Appeal following opposition | 29.03.2006 | Appeal received No. T0493/06 | 12.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.09.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 18.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 21.03.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2004/07] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 27.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO9209690 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [X] - MCCAFFERTY J., ET AL., "PHASE ANTIBODIES: FILAMENTOUS PHAGE DISPLAYING ANTIBODY VARIABLE DOMAINS.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19901206), vol. 348., doi:10.1038/348552a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 552 - 554., XP002024992 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/348552a0 | [Y] - WARD E. S., ET AL., "BINDING ACTIVITIES OF A REOPERTOIRE OF SINGLE IMMUNOGLOBULIN VARIABLE DOMAINS SECRETED FROM ESCHERICHIA COLI.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19891012), vol. 341., no. 6242., doi:10.1038/341544a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 544 - 546., XP000086104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/341544a0 | [X] - CWIRLA S. E., ET AL., "PEPTIDES ON PHAGE: A VAST LIBRARY OF PEPTIDES FOR IDENTIFYING LIGANDS.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19900801), vol. 87., no. 16., doi:10.1073/pnas.87.16.6378, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6378 - 6382., XP000141872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.16.6378 | [X] - SCOTT J. K., SMITH G. P., "SEARCHING FOR PEPTIDE LIGANDS WITH AN EPITOPE LIBRARY.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19900727), vol. 249., doi:10.1126/science.1696028, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 386 - 390., XP002003037 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1696028 | [XP] - BREITLING F., ET AL., "A SURFACE EXPRESSION VECTOR FOR ANTIBODY SCREENING.", GENE., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19910101), vol. 104., doi:10.1016/0378-1119(91)90244-6, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 147 - 153., XP002046118 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(91)90244-6 |