EP0544897 - STONE SLAB SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.F. MEYERS COMPANY, INC. 1017 14th Street Bedford Indiana 47421 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states W.F. MEYERS COMPANY, INC. 1017 14th Street Bedford Indiana 47421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISH, Donald, D. 1212 K. Street Bedford, IN 47421 / US | 02 /
STANDISH, James, K. R16, Box 86 Bedford, IN 47421 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92914959.9 | 17.06.1992 | [1993/23] | WO1992US05092 | Priority number, date | US19910721161 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: US 721161 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300208 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544897 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544897 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/08 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B23D59/04 (EP,US);
B28D1/04 (KR);
B28D1/08 (EP,US);
B28D1/124 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | STEINPLATTENSÄGE | [1993/23] | English: | STONE SLAB SAW | [1993/23] | French: | SCIE POUR DALLES DE PIERRE | [1993/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2154428 (TULLIUS THERESIA); | [YD]US4945889 (FISH DONALD D [US]); | [A]BE865189 (MADRIGALI LUIGI); | [A]EP0336253 (MVZ MASCHBAU VERZAHNUNG [DE]); | [A]FR600511 | International search | [Y]US1043433 (JACKSON THADDEUS A [US]); | [A]US4920947 (SCOTT LEWIS A [US], et al); | [A]SU419402 ; | [A]EP0014776 (LAMBOT HONORE JOSEPH); | [A]FR1241807 |