EP0591436 - SYSTEM FOR GROWING AND MANIPULATING TISSUE CULTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Costar Corporation One Alewife Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states COSTAR CORPORATION One Alewife Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROOT, David Allen Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92914993.8 | 22.06.1992 | [1994/15] | WO1992US05296 | Priority number, date | US19910721250 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: US 721250 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300420 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591436 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591436 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/20, B01L3/00 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
C12M23/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KULTIVIERUNG UND MANIPULIERUNG VON ZELLEN | [1994/15] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GROWING AND MANIPULATING TISSUE CULTURES | [1994/15] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT LA CROISSANCE ET LA MANIPULATION DE CULTURES DE TISSU | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AT170898B (TALERT TALALMANYOKAT ERTEKESIT); | [A]CH370873 (ANKH LAB INC [US]); | [A]GB2155948 (SANDOZ LTD); | [A]EP0183973 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [A]WO8705533 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | Examination | US5026649 | - Culture of Animal Cells, A manual of basic technique, R.Ian Freshney, Pub. Alan Liss Inc. NY. |