EP0610217 - IMPROVEMENTS IN PAPER MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELTA CHEMICALS, INC. Kidder Road Searsport, ME 04974 / US | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIXLER, Harris J. RFD 1 Box 1411 Belfast, ME 04915 / US | 02 /
PEATS, Stephen East Fork Road, Box 4886 Camden, ME 04843 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92915046.4 | 12.06.1992 | [1994/33] | WO1992US05111 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325754 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610217 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/10, D21H23/14, D21H17/68 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
D21H23/14 (EP,US);
D21H17/29 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
D21H17/68 (EP,US);
D21H21/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/33] | D21H21/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IN DER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [1994/33] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN PAPER MAKING | [1994/33] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A LA FABRICATION DE PAPIER | [1994/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/27] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/27] | Request for further processing for: | 08.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4749444 (LORZ RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [Y]US4753710 (LANGLEY JOHN [GB], et al); | [Y]US5071512 (BIXLER HARRIS J [US], et al) |