EP0594699 - MULTIAXIS CNC TOOL HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EHLERDING, Andreas Sachsenhäger Strasse 3 D-31718 Pollhagen / DE | [1994/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | König, Norbert, et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 10 26 30010 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | König, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Leine & König Burckhardtstrasse 1 D-30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 92915050.6 | 10.07.1992 | [1994/18] | WO1992EP01567 | Priority number, date | DE19914123323 | 13.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123323 | [1994/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301021 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594699 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594699 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23Q15/00, G05B19/416 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B23K26/10 (EP,US);
B23K26/08 (EP,US);
B23K37/0235 (EP,US);
G05B19/416 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37493 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41457 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/18] | B23K26/00, B23Q15/00, G05B19/407 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | CNC-GESTEUERTE MEHRACHSIGE WERKZEUGTRÄGER | [1994/18] | English: | MULTIAXIS CNC TOOL HOLDER | [1994/18] | French: | PORTE-OUTIL A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE PAR ORDINATEUR ET TRAVAILLANT DANS PLUSIEURS AXES | [1994/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.12.1995 | ES | 06.12.1995 | NL | 06.12.1995 | CH | 31.07.1996 | LI | 31.07.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | DK | 06.12.1995 | |
ES | 06.12.1995 | ||
CH | 31.07.1996 | ||
LI | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 06.12.1995 | |
CH | 31.07.1996 | ||
LI | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 31.07.1996 | |
LI | 31.07.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0010578 (EHRENREICH GMBH & CO KG A [DE]); | [A]US4338672 (PERZLEY WILLIAM, et al); | [X]EP0086950 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4528632 (NIO SATORU [JP], et al); | [X]US4594671 (SUGIMOTO KOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US4734866 (BARTELT RICHARD [DE], et al); | [A]EP0483756 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 13, Nr 309, P898, Zusammenfassung von JP 01- 81011, publ 1989-03-27 |