EP0594703 - A PERSONAL CLEANSING FREEZER BAR MADE WITH A RIGID, INTERLOCKING MESH OF NEUTRALIZED CARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANERI, James, Eden 5534 Heron Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
KACHER, Mark, Leslie 9731 Montclaire Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | 03 /
KOCZWARA, Constance, Sagel 3252 Ashwood Drive Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US | 04 /
HEDGES, Steven, Kirk 2657 Astro Court Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 05 /
LESLIE, Thomas, Foster 3061 Balsam Court Edgewood, KY 41017 / US | 06 /
EVANS, Marcus, Wayne 961 Sarbrook Drive Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915121.5 | 26.06.1992 | [1994/18] | WO1992US05335 | Priority number, date | US19910731163 | 15.07.1991 Original published format: US 731163 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302174 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594703 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594703 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D13/12, C11D13/18, C11D1/04, C11D9/00, C11D10/04 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
C11D17/006 (EP,US);
C11D10/04 (EP,US);
C11D13/12 (EP,US);
C11D13/18 (EP,US);
C11D1/10 (EP,US);
C11D1/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | EIN MIT EINER AUS NEUTRALISIERTER CARBONSAUERE FESTEN, INEINANDERGREIFENDEN MASCHE HERGESTELLTES KOERPERWASCHMITTELGEFRIERSTUECK | [1994/18] | English: | A PERSONAL CLEANSING FREEZER BAR MADE WITH A RIGID, INTERLOCKING MESH OF NEUTRALIZED CARBOXYLIC ACID | [1994/18] | French: | SAVONNETTE DETERGENTE A USAGE PERSONNEL FABRIQUEE A PARTIR D'UN MAILLAGE A ENTRECROISEMENT RIGIDE A BASE D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE NEUTRALISE | [1994/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Request for further processing for: | 01.09.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.10.1996 | LI | 23.10.1996 | NL | 23.10.1996 | SE | 23.01.1997 | LU | 30.06.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/07] | CH | 23.10.1996 | |
LI | 23.10.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 23.10.1996 | |
LI | 23.10.1996 | ||
SE | 23.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | SE | 23.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3226329 (KILMER MACMILLAN FRANCIS S); | [A]US3835058 (WHITE R); | [A]FR2348967 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [A]EP0155915 (MAZEMARK LIMITED [GB]); | [AP]WO9205241 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [XP]WO9209679 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | Examination | - US Patent Application 617 827 |