EP0641338 - HYPOGLYCEMIC THIAZOLIDINEDIONES AND INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, David, A. 16 Walnut Hill Road East Lyme, CT 06333 / US | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1995/10] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915346.8 | 01.07.1992 | [1995/10] | WO1992US05436 | Priority number, date | US19910733771 | 22.07.1991 Original published format: US 733771 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302079 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641338 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/10, A61K31/425, C07D263/32, C07F7/18 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
C07D417/10 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/10] | Title | German: | HYPOGLYKÄMISCHE THIAZOLIDENDION-DERIVATE UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | [1995/10] | English: | HYPOGLYCEMIC THIAZOLIDINEDIONES AND INTERMEDIATES | [1995/10] | French: | THIAZOLIDINEDIONES HYPOGLYCEMIQUES ET INTERMEDIAIRES | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/19] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/19] | Request for further processing for: | 14.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0332332 (PFIZER [US]) |