07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
23.07.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] |
16.07.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] |
09.07.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
25.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
21.05.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
24.07.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] |
17.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.09.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.08.1996 |
First examination report |
|
27.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.07.1994 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] |
16.06.1994 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |
25.03.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
25.03.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |