EP0574554 - DRIVER CIRCUIT FOR A PLURALITY OF GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA LIGHTING INC. 887 Deerfield Parkway Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [1993/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOISIN, Mihail, S. 20 E. Marion Ave. Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property, Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property, Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1997/04] | Dearling, Bruce Clive Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint, Alencon Link GB-Basingstoke, Hants. RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1993/51] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915617.2 | 06.03.1992 | [1993/51] | WO1992US01873 | Priority number, date | US19910665829 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: US 665829 | US19910753496 | 03.09.1991 Original published format: US 753496 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9216082 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574554 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574554 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
H05B41/282 (EP);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR MEHRERE GASENTLADUNGSLAMPEN | [1993/51] | English: | DRIVER CIRCUIT FOR A PLURALITY OF GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS | [1993/51] | French: | CIRCUIT D'EXCITATION POUR UNE PLURALITE DE LAMPES A DECHARGE DE GAZ | [1993/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Request for further processing for: | 27.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.1997 | BE | 11.06.1997 | DK | 11.06.1997 | NL | 11.06.1997 | SE | 11.09.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
DK | 11.06.1997 | ||
SE | 11.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
SE | 11.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 11.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4127797 (PERPER LLOYD J); | [A]GB2071954 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]GB2120873 (PHILIPS CORP); | [XP]US5081401 (MOISIN MIHAIL S [US]) |