EP0595933 - PROBE FOR SURFACE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LTD 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, Clive 154A Toms Lane Kings Langley Hertfordshire WD4 8NZ / GB | 02 /
GREGORIOU, Gregorios 93 Warwick Road New Southgate London N11 2SP / GB | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Buttrick, Richard, et al BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Buttrick, Richard, et al British Technology Group Ltd, 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/19] | Gaskin, John Shield Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92915961.4 | 24.07.1992 | [1994/19] | WO1992GB01373 | Priority number, date | GB19910016115 | 25.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9116115 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302337 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595933 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595933 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/30 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G01B11/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Sonde zur Oberflächenmessung | [1994/19] | English: | PROBE FOR SURFACE MEASUREMENT | [1994/19] | French: | SONDE DE MESURE DE SURFACES | [1994/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 30.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.01.1998 | LI | 14.01.1998 | SE | 14.04.1998 | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/43] | SE | 14.04.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8907037 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]); | [X]WO9010195 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]WO9015306 (BEI ELECTRONICS [US]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY vol. 9, no. 4, April 1991, NEW YORK,US pages 545 - 551 GANG HE, FRANK W. CUOMO 'A LIGHT INTENSITY FUNCTION SUITABLE FOR MULTIMODE FIBER-OPTIC SENSORS' | [Y] - SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS vol. 18, no. 10, October 1988, WOODBURY,NY,US pages 1295 - 1298 L.I. ZHMUROVA, V.N. KULIKOV, N. MALOV 'COHERENT OPTICAL SYSTEM WITH A SYNTHETIZED APERTURE FOR DETERMINATION OF GEOMETRIC PARAMETERS OF AN OBJECT' |