EP0553319 - METHOD OF SEPARATING A MIXTURE OF PLASTICS COMPRISING AT LEAST THREE COMPONENTS USING ELECTROSTATIC TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KALI UND SALZ BETEILIGUNGS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 10 20 29 D-34111 Kassel / DE | [1996/21] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states KALI UND SALZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 10 20 29 D-34111 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAHL, Ingo Staufenbergstr. 31 D-3502 Vellmar / DE | 02 /
HOLLSTEIN, Axel Löwenburgstr. 1a D-3500 Kassel / DE | 03 /
KLEINE-KLEFFMANN, Ulrich Am Wendeberg 25 D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 04 /
GEISLER, Iring An der Sommerseite 4a D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 05 /
NEITZEL, Ulrich Am Donarbrunnen 28 D-3500 Kassel / DE | [1993/31] | Application number, filing date | 92916022.4 | 04.07.1992 | [1993/31] | WO1992EP01613 | Priority number, date | DE19914127572 | 21.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4127572 | [1993/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303848 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553319 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553319 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06, B03B5/28, B29B17/02, B03C7/00, B03C7/12 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
B03B5/30 (EP,US);
B03B9/06 (KR);
B03B9/061 (EP,US);
B03C7/00 (EP,US);
B03C7/003 (EP,US);
B03C7/006 (EP,US);
B03C7/12 (EP,US);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0203 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0244 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0265 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/003 (EP,US);
B29K2711/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG EINES KUNSTSTOFFGEMENGES AUS MINDESTENS DREI KOMPONENTEN UNTER ANWENDUNG DER ELEKTROSTATIK | [1993/31] | English: | METHOD OF SEPARATING A MIXTURE OF PLASTICS COMPRISING AT LEAST THREE COMPONENTS USING ELECTROSTATIC TECHNIQUES | [1993/31] | French: | PROCEDE FAISANT APPEL AUX TECHNIQUES ELECTROSTATIQUES POUR LA SEPARATION D'UN MELANGE DE MATIERES PLASTIQUES COMPORTANT AU MOINS TROIS COMPOSANTS | [1993/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP59049858 ; | [A]DE940341 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [Y]US4199109 (WATANABE TADAO [JP]); | [A]GB2078138 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [Y]US4728045 (TOMASZEK THOMAS R [US]); | [A]EP0279200 (ORGAN FASER TECHNOLOGY CO [NL]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 138 (C-231)(1575) 27. Juni 1984 & JP,A,59 049 858 ( FUJI ) 22. März 1984, & JP59049858 A 00000000 |