EP0641312 - SYNTHETIC ARYL POLYAMINES AS EXCITATORY AMINO ACID NEUROTRANSMITTER ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | For all designated states NPS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 420 Chipeta Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | ||
For all designated states NPS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 420 Chipeta Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACCOMANO, Nicholas, Alex 4 Paint Mill Drive Ledyard, CT 06339 / US | 02 /
VOLKMANN, Robert, Alfred 135 Dogwood Lane Mystic, CT 06355 / US | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Moore, James William, Dr. Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92916921.7 | 10.08.1992 | [1995/10] | WO1992US06482 | Priority number, date | US19910749014 | 23.08.1991 Original published format: US 749014 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304036 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641312 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/40, A61K31/405, C07D213/56, C07D209/18, C07F17/02, A61K31/44, A61K31/165, A61K31/295 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
C07C233/40 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
C07D209/18 (EP);
C07D213/56 (EP);
C07F17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/10] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE ARYLPOLYAMINE ALS ANTAGONISTEN VON ANREGBAREN AMINOSÄURE-NEUROTRANSMITTERN | [1995/10] | English: | SYNTHETIC ARYL POLYAMINES AS EXCITATORY AMINO ACID NEUROTRANSMITTER ANTAGONISTS | [1995/10] | French: | POLYAMINES D'ARYLE SYNTHETIQUES UTILISEES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE NEUROTRANSMETTEURS D'ACIDES AMINES DE L'EXCITATION | [1995/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/34] | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0436332 (PFIZER [US], et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 21, 27 May 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 207201, 'PREPARATION OF POLYAMINES AS GLUTAMATE RECEPTOR INHIBITORS' page 804 ; |