EP0607157 - TRACK-GUIDED TRANSPORT VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRÜNDL UND HOFFMANN GESELLSCHAFT FÜR ELEKTROTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN MBH Petersbrunner Strasse 4 82319 Starnberg / DE | For all designated states RICHERT, Withold Am Hackeberg 34 D-41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [1998/46] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states GRÜNDL UND HOFFMANN GESELLSCHAFT FÜR ELEKTROTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN MBH Petersbrunner Strasse 4 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
For all designated states RICHERT, Withold Am Hackeberg 34 D-41836 Hückelhoven / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHERT, Withold Am Hackeberg 34 D-5142 Hückelhoven / DE | 02 /
GRÜNDL, Andreas Haseneystr. 20 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Bernhard Jakob-Tresch-Str. 9 D-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92917018.1 | 07.08.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992EP01805 | Priority number, date | DE19914126453 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4126453 | [1994/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302889 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607157 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607157 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/00, B60V3/04 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
B60V3/04 (EP,US);
B60L15/005 (EP,US);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/30] | B60L13/02, B60L15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/30] | Title | German: | SPURGEFÜHRTES TRANSPORTFAHRZEUG | [1994/30] | English: | TRACK-GUIDED TRANSPORT VEHICLE | [1994/30] | French: | VEHICULE GUIDE DE TRANSPORT | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.04.1994 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 15.04.1994 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   15.04.1994 | 15.04.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.1994 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.1994 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.04.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.11.1998 | FR | 11.11.1998 | GB | 11.11.1998 | IT | 11.11.1998 | AT | 07.08.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 11.11.1998 | |
FR | 11.11.1998 | ||
GB | 11.11.1998 | ||
AT | 07.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 11.11.1998 | |
GB | 11.11.1998 | ||
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
AT | 07.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/11] | GB | 11.11.1998 | |
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
AT | 07.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | GB | 11.11.1998 | |
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 11.11.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3623433 (JARVIS EDWARD ALFRED KEITH); | [A]DE2423579 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2455911 (HEIDELBERG GOETZ); | [A] - REVUE GENERALE DE L'ELECTRICITE Bd. 84, Nr. 2, Februar 1975, PARIS FR Seiten 112 - 120 A.WIART 'PROPULSION ELECTRIQUE A GRANDE VITESSE' | [AP] - SHIBATA M., ET AL., "ON-BOARD POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM OF A MAGNETICALLY LEVITATED VEHICLE.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920101), vol. 28., no. 01., doi:10.1109/20.119914, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 474 - 477., XP000258042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.119914 |