|
10.04.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1994 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.10.1993 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.1993 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.1993 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
02.09.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |