EP0653977 - APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A TRUSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gang-Nail Systems Limited Christy Estate Ivy Road Aldershot Hampshire GU12 4XG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states GANG-NAIL SYSTEMS LIMITED Christy Estate, Ivy Road Aldershot, Hampshire GU12 4XG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHALE, Luke Richard John Stonehill, Lymington Bottom Road, Medstead Alton, Hampshire GU34 5EP / GB | 02 /
SHUTTLE, Alan Peter 16 Copse Avenue, Weybourne Farnham, Surrey GU9 9ED / GB | 03 /
BEALE, Leonard Michael 5a Wrecclesham Hill Farnham, Surrey GU9 4JM / GB | 04 /
GOEBEL, James Francis Pirrie, SMJ Developments Ltd Nutfield, White Lane, Ash Green Aldershot, Hampshire GU12 6HW / GB | 05 /
McCULLY, Michael Anthony, SMJ Developments Ltd. Nutfield, White Lane, Ash Green Aldershot, Hants GU126HW / GB | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Smith, Gillian Ruth Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Smith, Gillian Ruth MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92917255.9 | 10.08.1992 | [1995/21] | WO1992GB01480 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403312 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653977 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653977 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B27M3/00, B27F7/15 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
B27F7/155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINEM GITTERTRÄGER | [1995/21] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A TRUSS | [1995/21] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA CONSTRUCTION DE CHARPENTES | [1995/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.11.1996 | BE | 27.11.1996 | CH | 27.11.1996 | DK | 27.11.1996 | ES | 27.11.1996 | GR | 27.11.1996 | IT | 27.11.1996 | LI | 27.11.1996 | NL | 27.11.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
DK | 27.11.1996 | ||
ES | 27.11.1996 | ||
GR | 27.11.1996 | ||
IT | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
NL | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
DK | 27.11.1996 | ||
ES | 27.11.1996 | ||
GR | 27.11.1996 | ||
IT | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
DK | 27.11.1996 | ||
GR | 27.11.1996 | ||
IT | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
DK | 27.11.1996 | ||
IT | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
DK | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
CH | 27.11.1996 | ||
LI | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 27.11.1996 | |
BE | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 27.11.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3599562 (HUTCHENS RALPH W SR); | [A]US4365734 (HARRIS RODERICK E); | [X]US4669184 (CASTILLO ADOLFO [US]); | [X]US4998336 (PAPSDORF JOHN [US]); | [Y]US5092028 (HARNDEN CHARLES W [US]) | [Y] - US,A,RE27692 (POST) 3 July 1973 |