EP0598009 - CONTINUOUS NATAMYCIN PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-TECHNICAL RESOURCES L.P. 1035 South 7th Street Manitowoc, WI 54220 / US | [1996/36] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states BIO-TECHNICAL RESOURCES, INC. 1035 South Seventh Street Manitowoc Wisconsin 54220 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Phillip, Terry 3220 Waldo Boulevard Manitowoc, WI 54220 / US | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1994/21] | Woodcraft, David Charles BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92917489.4 | 03.08.1992 | [1994/21] | WO1992US06499 | Priority number, date | US19910740536 | 05.08.1991 Original published format: US 740536 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9303171 | Date: | 18.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598009 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598009 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/62 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
C12P19/626 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/21] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHE NATAMYCINPRODUKTION | [1994/21] | English: | CONTINUOUS NATAMYCIN PRODUCTION | [1994/21] | French: | PRODUCTION CONTINUE DE NATAMYCINE | [1994/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB846933 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | [X]US3015612 (JOHN PIRT STANLEY, et al); | [X]US4167450 (CHESBRO WILLIAM R, et al); | [A]WO8400777 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU]) | [A] - Dialog Information Services, file 5, BIOSIS, Dialog accession no. 4939650, Biosis accession no. 80066961, Robertson C R et al: "Dual aerobic hollow-fiber bioreactor for cultivation of streptomyces- aureofaciens", Biotechnol Bioeng 27 (7), 1985, 1012-1020 |