blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0599962

EP0599962 - DISPENSING DEVICE FOR TWO FLUID MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIS, Adrian Francis, SmithKline Beecham
Consumer Brands, St. Georges's Avenue
Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0DE / GB
02 / LORSCHEIDT, Willy, Josef Wischerath GmbH & Co. KG
Fuchsweg 9
Postfach 40 06 63, D-5000 Köln 40 / DE
03 / WILKINS, David Reed, SmithKline Beecham plc
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[1994/23]
Representative(s)Walker, Ralph Francis
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]Walker, Ralph Francis, Dr.
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB
Application number, filing date92918159.221.08.1992
[1994/23]
WO1992GB01542
Priority number, dateGB1991001871131.08.1991         Original published format: GB 9118711
[1994/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9304940
Date:18.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0599962
Date:08.06.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0599962
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:B65D47/34, B65D81/32
[1994/23]
CPC:
B05B11/028 (EP,US); B05B11/1085 (EP,US); B05B11/1074 (EP,US);
B05B11/1001 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/23]
TitleGerman:AUSTRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZWEI FLIESSFÄHIGE MEDIEN[1994/23]
English:DISPENSING DEVICE FOR TWO FLUID MATERIALS[1994/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR POUR DEUX SUBSTANCES FLUIDES[1994/23]
Entry into regional phase08.02.1994National basic fee paid 
08.02.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
08.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/23]
18.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1999Fee for grant paid
27.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:29.10.1998Request for further processing filed
29.10.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.11.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
IE21.08.2000
LU21.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
IE21.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
IE21.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
IE21.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/23]AT12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
IE21.08.2000
Former [2001/50]AT12.01.2000
IE21.08.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4438871  (ECKERT JOSEF [DE]);
 [Y]EP0202359  (SCHAEFFER HANS A)
ExaminationEP0151953
 EP0152953
 EP0378286
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.