Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06504237 | Global Dossier | 19.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9201971 | 27.08.1992 | DE4128887 | 30.08.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9304822 | Global Dossier | 18.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4128887 | 30.08.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0555443 | Global Dossier | 18.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4128887 | 30.08.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4128887 | 04.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4128887 | 30.08.1991 |